Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SCR1002 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 29, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024