Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SCR1006 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 23, 2024
Analysis February 27, 2024
Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024