House | 03/06/2024 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |