Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SCR1007 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2024

Engrossed

Bill January 31, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis March 5, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024