Senate | 02/27/2024 | Senate motion to amend | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |