Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SCR1015 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 22, 2024
Analysis February 27, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024