Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SCR1023 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2024

Engrossed

Bill June 12, 2024
Bill February 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis June 14, 2024
Analysis June 13, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024