Arizona 2025 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2040 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 8, 2025

Engrossed

Bill February 25, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis February 26, 2025
Analysis February 21, 2025
Analysis February 17, 2025