Senate | 04/01/2025 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-2-0) | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-4-2-0) | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Assigned to House ED Committee | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Introduced in House and read first time |