Arizona 2025 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2677 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 31, 2025
Fiscal Note January 31, 2025
Bill January 22, 2025

Engrossed

Bill February 26, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis April 2, 2025
Analysis March 24, 2025
Analysis February 27, 2025
Analysis February 14, 2025
Analysis February 7, 2025