Arizona 2025 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1464 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2025

Engrossed

Bill February 25, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis March 12, 2025
Analysis March 7, 2025
Analysis February 25, 2025
Analysis February 6, 2025
Analysis February 6, 2025