California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1048 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2010

Amended

Bill July 15, 2010
Bill July 16, 2009
Bill June 1, 2009
Bill March 31, 2009