LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1048
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1048
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1048
Compare Versions
AB1048 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB1048 Enrolled August 30, 2010
AB1048 Amended July 15, 2010
AB1048 Amended July 16, 2009
AB1048 Amended June 1, 2009
AB1048 Amended March 31, 2009
AB1048 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1048 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB1048 Enrolled August 30, 2010
AB1048 Amended July 15, 2010
AB1048 Amended July 16, 2009
AB1048 Amended June 1, 2009
AB1048 Amended March 31, 2009
AB1048 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare