|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 401, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2813.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1968.)
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1177.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/10/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|