LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB11
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB11
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB11
Compare Versions
AB11 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB11 Enrolled September 2, 2009
AB11 Amended July 14, 2009
AB11 Amended April 23, 2009
AB11 Amended March 9, 2009
AB11 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 1 (Old)
AB11 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB11 Enrolled September 2, 2009
AB11 Amended July 14, 2009
AB11 Amended April 23, 2009
AB11 Amended March 9, 2009
AB11 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 2 (New)
Compare