|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6373.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6376.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 4597.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3912.)
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (January 21).
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 12).
|
|
|
|
01/07/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 7).
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|