LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB113
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB113
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB113
Compare Versions
AB113 Enrolled August 24, 2010
AB113 Amended August 16, 2010
AB113 Amended June 23, 2010
AB113 Amended January 4, 2010
AB113 Amended April 28, 2009
AB113 Introduced January 13, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB113 Enrolled August 24, 2010
AB113 Amended August 16, 2010
AB113 Amended June 23, 2010
AB113 Amended January 4, 2010
AB113 Amended April 28, 2009
AB113 Introduced January 13, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare