|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3372.)
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2390.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 1749.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|