LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1132
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1132
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1132
Compare Versions
AB1132 Enrolled September 21, 2009
AB1132 Amended September 4, 2009
AB1132 Amended July 16, 2009
AB1132 Amended June 23, 2009
AB1132 Amended May 11, 2009
AB1132 Amended April 22, 2009
AB1132 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1132 Enrolled September 21, 2009
AB1132 Amended September 4, 2009
AB1132 Amended July 16, 2009
AB1132 Amended June 23, 2009
AB1132 Amended May 11, 2009
AB1132 Amended April 22, 2009
AB1132 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare