|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 389, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 21. Page 3296.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 2334.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 1539.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS. by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on P.E.,R. & S.S. and INS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|