LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1227
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1227
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1227
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 27, 2009
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 17, 2009
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
October 11, 2009
Compare
Amended
Bill
September 4, 2009
Compare
Bill
June 15, 2009
Compare