|
07/07/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 30. Page 2045.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|