California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1316 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Amended

Bill June 1, 2009
Bill May 13, 2009
Bill May 5, 2009
Bill April 22, 2009