|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 524, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3298.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 2313.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11))
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1751.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|