LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1330
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1330
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1330
Compare Versions
AB1330 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB1330 Enrolled September 17, 2009
AB1330 Amended July 13, 2009
AB1330 Amended May 5, 2009
AB1330 Amended April 22, 2009
AB1330 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1330 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB1330 Enrolled September 17, 2009
AB1330 Amended July 13, 2009
AB1330 Amended May 5, 2009
AB1330 Amended April 22, 2009
AB1330 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare