|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 442, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6797.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6680.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4597.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to JR 61(b)(14).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1557.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 11).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|