California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1341 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2010

Amended

Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 28, 2010
Bill April 2, 2009