LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB135
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB135
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB135
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 20, 2009
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 24, 2009
Compare
Bill
July 13, 2009
Compare
Bill
May 29, 2009
Compare
Bill
May 4, 2009
Compare
Bill
April 1, 2009
Compare