LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB135
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB135
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB135
Compare Versions
AB135 Amended August 24, 2009
AB135 Amended July 13, 2009
AB135 Amended May 29, 2009
AB135 Amended May 4, 2009
AB135 Amended April 1, 2009
AB135 Introduced January 20, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB135 Amended August 24, 2009
AB135 Amended July 13, 2009
AB135 Amended May 29, 2009
AB135 Amended May 4, 2009
AB135 Amended April 1, 2009
AB135 Introduced January 20, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare