|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 221, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2970.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2973.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2060.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1460.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 20.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|