California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB136 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill August 17, 2009
Bill June 1, 2009
Bill April 29, 2009
Bill March 23, 2009