|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 533, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 62. Noes 16. Page 6639.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 24).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 9. Page 4495.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 30. Page 2056.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1936.).
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|