California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1373 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2010

Amended

Bill June 29, 2010
Bill June 2, 2010
Bill June 2, 2009
Bill April 14, 2009