|
07/06/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 36, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5697.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after May 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
03/08/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 3837.)
|
|
|
|
01/15/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (January 13).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|