California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1374 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill June 18, 2010

Chaptered

Bill July 6, 2010

Amended

Bill March 8, 2010
Bill January 15, 2010
Bill January 4, 2010