|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and V.A.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 3863.)
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21).
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 12).
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 5).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on J.,E.D., & E. and V.A.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|