California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1378 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Amended

Bill August 20, 2010
Bill August 17, 2010
Bill June 16, 2010
Bill January 4, 2010