California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1378 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/17/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1378AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 17, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 16, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Members V. Manuel Perez, Fletcher, and Salas FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to add  Section 14013.5 to   and repeal Section 14013.5 of  the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to workforce investment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1378, as amended, V. Manuel Perez. California Workforce Investment Board: veterans workforce program. The federal Workforce Investment Act of 1998 provides for workforce investment activities, including activities in which states may participate. Under existing law, the California Workforce Investment Board is responsible for assisting the Governor in the development, oversight, and continuous improvement of California's workforce investment system. Existing law requires the board, among other things, to assist the Governor with promoting the development of a well-educated and highly skilled workforce and developing the State Workforce Investment Plan. This bill would establish the Veterans Workforce Accountability Act for the purpose of providing a method for the comprehensive and transparent evaluation of expenditures for veteran workforce development programs in the state, as specified. The bill would require the board to conduct an  annual  assessment of those programs, and, in consultation with the Employment Training Panel, the Department of Veterans Affairs, and representatives of the Employment Development Department, to implement and administer provisions of the act, as provided. The bill would require the board, to  annually  report to the Governor and the appropriate legislative policy and budget committees  by December 31, 2011,  on the effectiveness of existing job skills development, training, and referral programs for military veterans who are transitioning to civilian work. The bill would provide that the provisions of the bill shall only be implemented to the extent that federal funds are made available to the state for the purposes of the bill. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14013.5 is added to the Unemployment Insurance Code, to read: 14013.5. (a) The Veterans Workforce Accountability Act is hereby established for the purpose of providing a method for the comprehensive and transparent evaluation of expenditures for veteran workforce development programs in the state. The board shall conduct an  annual  assessment evaluating the effectiveness of those programs that assist veterans with the transition to civilian work, which are funded with federal moneys provided to the state, including the approximately eighteen million dollar ($18,000,000) annual grant that the state receives from the United States Department of Labor. (b) The board, in consultation with the Employment Training Panel, the Department of Veterans Affairs, and representatives of the department shall outline, implement, and administer this section. The board shall also develop clear, comprehensive, and transparent objectives, and appropriate criteria that may be used to evaluate the effectiveness of existing workforce training and job referral programs for veterans. (c) The assessment required to be prepared pursuant to this section shall evaluate all of the following: (1) The extent to which moneys are being expended for outreach, assessment of job skills and interests, and the referral of veterans to specific training opportunities and prospective job placement. The outreach measures required to be assessed pursuant to this subdivision shall also include an evaluation of the provision of information to veterans regarding ways to finance training opportunities that require fees or the payment of tuition. (2) The extent to which moneys are being expended for the assessment of job skills acquired during military service that may be used, or adapted for use, for civilian purposes by the veteran client. (3) The extent to which moneys are being expended to provide workforce training and job referral programs for eligible veterans at one-stop career centers. (d) The board shall  annually  report to the Governor and the appropriate legislative policy and budget committees  by December 31, 2011,  on the effectiveness of existing job skills and employment opportunities provided to military veterans who are transitioning to civilian work. (e) This section shall only be implemented to the extent that federal funds are made available to the state for purposes of this section.  (f) (1) A report to be submitted pursuant to subdivision (d) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code.   (2) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on December 31, 2015.