California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1383 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 22, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill August 18, 2009
Bill July 15, 2009
Bill July 9, 2009
Bill July 1, 2009
Bill June 25, 2009
Bill June 17, 2009
Bill June 11, 2009
Bill June 1, 2009
Bill May 14, 2009
Bill April 30, 2009