LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1383
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1383
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1383
Compare Versions
AB1383 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB1383 Enrolled September 22, 2009
AB1383 Amended August 18, 2009
AB1383 Amended July 15, 2009
AB1383 Amended July 9, 2009
AB1383 Amended July 1, 2009
AB1383 Amended June 25, 2009
AB1383 Amended June 17, 2009
AB1383 Amended June 11, 2009
AB1383 Amended June 1, 2009
AB1383 Amended May 14, 2009
AB1383 Amended April 30, 2009
AB1383 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1383 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB1383 Enrolled September 22, 2009
AB1383 Amended August 18, 2009
AB1383 Amended July 15, 2009
AB1383 Amended July 9, 2009
AB1383 Amended July 1, 2009
AB1383 Amended June 25, 2009
AB1383 Amended June 17, 2009
AB1383 Amended June 11, 2009
AB1383 Amended June 1, 2009
AB1383 Amended May 14, 2009
AB1383 Amended April 30, 2009
AB1383 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare