|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 394, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 3268.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2290.)
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 4. Page 1923.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|