LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1423
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1423
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1423
Compare Versions
AB1423 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB1423 Enrolled September 16, 2009
AB1423 Amended September 3, 2009
AB1423 Amended July 14, 2009
AB1423 Amended June 30, 2009
AB1423 Amended May 5, 2009
AB1423 Amended April 15, 2009
AB1423 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1423 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB1423 Enrolled September 16, 2009
AB1423 Amended September 3, 2009
AB1423 Amended July 14, 2009
AB1423 Amended June 30, 2009
AB1423 Amended May 5, 2009
AB1423 Amended April 15, 2009
AB1423 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare