|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3088.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2132.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 23).
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 1804.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 12. Page 1684.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|