BILL NUMBER: AB 1439ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 2, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 8, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 26, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 18, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 9, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 30, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 26, 2009 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 16, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Solorio (Coauthors: Assembly Members Arambula, Caballero, Huffman, and Torres) FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to add Section 13827.3 to the Penal Code, relating to gangs. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1439, Solorio. Gang and youth violence: prevention. Under existing law, the Office of Gang and Youth Violence Policy, which is in the Governor's Office of Emergency Services, is responsible for identifying and evaluating gang and youth violence programs and strategies, along with funding for those efforts. The Director of the Office of Gang and Youth Violence Policy is responsible for monitoring, assessing, and coordinating the state's gang and youth violence programs, as specified. This bill would require the director, subject to statutory limits and directives, to make recommendations to streamline existing state agency gang and youth violence grant programs with a goal toward giving priority to grant programs that employ evidence-based practices. It would require the director to create a working group consisting of representatives of state offices and representatives of other specified stakeholders to assist in this effort, with the director serving as the chairperson. The bill would require the working group to advise the office on the task of streamlining grant programs that address gang and youth violence, in accordance with certain procedures. The working group would be responsible for making recommendations to streamline existing state agency gang and youth violence grant programs, including recommending procedures and requirements for state agencies and departments administering grant programs to provide incentives for grant recipients to implement evidence-based practices. The bill would require the Office of Gang and Youth Violence Policy to report the findings of the working group to the Legislature and the Governor by June 1, 2010. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 13827.3 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 13827.3. (a) The director shall, subject to statutory limits and directives, make recommendations to streamline existing state agency gang and youth violence grant programs with a goal toward giving priority to grant programs that employ evidence-based practices. The director shall create a working group to assist in this effort and shall serve as the chairperson of the working group. (b) The working group of the Office of Gang and Youth Violence Policy shall consist of representatives of state offices and representatives of other stakeholders specified in paragraph (3) of subdivision (b) of Section 13827. The working group shall advise the office on the task of streamlining grant programs that address gang and youth violence, in accordance with subdivisions (c) and (d). (c) The working group shall be responsible for making recommendations to streamline existing state agency gang and youth violence grant programs, including, but not limited to, making recommendations for consolidation of programs, aligning funding cycles, and developing common applications for grant programs. The Office of Gang and Youth Violence Policy shall prepare the recommendations of the working group pursuant to this subdivision on or before March 1, 2010, and shall submit a final report of its findings to the Legislature and the Governor on or before June 1, 2010. This subdivision does not require the other stakeholders in the working group to participate in the preparation of the final report. (d) As part of its recommendations pursuant to subdivision (c), the Office of Gang and Youth Violence Policy shall also recommend procedures and requirements for state agencies and departments that administer gang and youth violence grant programs to provide incentives for grant recipients to implement evidence-based practices.