California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB144 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill June 24, 2009
Bill May 11, 2009
Bill April 15, 2009
Bill March 2, 2009