LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB144
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB144
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB144
Compare Versions
AB144 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB144 Enrolled September 4, 2009
AB144 Amended June 24, 2009
AB144 Amended May 11, 2009
AB144 Amended April 15, 2009
AB144 Amended March 2, 2009
AB144 Introduced January 22, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB144 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB144 Enrolled September 4, 2009
AB144 Amended June 24, 2009
AB144 Amended May 11, 2009
AB144 Amended April 15, 2009
AB144 Amended March 2, 2009
AB144 Introduced January 22, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare