|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 3191.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 3216.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 2175.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Padilla.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 22. Page 754.)
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (March 18).
|
|
|
|
01/23/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
|
|
|
|
01/22/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|