LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB146
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB146
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB146
Compare Versions
AB146 Enrolled September 11, 2009
AB146 Amended September 1, 2009
AB146 Amended June 18, 2009
AB146 Amended March 25, 2009
AB146 Introduced January 22, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB146 Enrolled September 11, 2009
AB146 Amended September 1, 2009
AB146 Amended June 18, 2009
AB146 Amended March 25, 2009
AB146 Introduced January 22, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare