|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 2170.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/20/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 32. Page 2058.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. by unanimous consent, and then be re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
|
|
|
|
01/22/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|