LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB147
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB147
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB147
Compare Versions
AB147 Enrolled September 11, 2009
AB147 Amended September 1, 2009
AB147 Amended August 17, 2009
AB147 Amended June 1, 2009
AB147 Amended May 5, 2009
AB147 Introduced January 22, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB147 Enrolled September 11, 2009
AB147 Amended September 1, 2009
AB147 Amended August 17, 2009
AB147 Amended June 1, 2009
AB147 Amended May 5, 2009
AB147 Introduced January 22, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare